Financial history FOSTER CARE ORGANISATION INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

Charity Number: 1081324
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.11k £37.02k £19.49k £480.40k £3.47k
Total expenditure £32.27k £16.32k £29.24k £441.06k £4.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A