RELATE WEST SURREY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relationship Counselling for individuals and couples, Family Counselling, Young Persons Counselling, Psychosexual Therapy and Learning and Education service.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Surrey
Governance
- 04 February 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Frank Cunnane | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Grahame Snelling | Trustee | 05 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Sophie Jenkins | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
kapil Bakshi | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Evans-Gordon | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amy Stephens | Trustee | 20 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosie Mckimmie | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison MACLENNAN | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gary Charles Couch | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £479.76k | £419.17k | £443.07k | £451.52k | £478.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £460.00k | £375.29k | £451.03k | £450.67k | £480.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £24.27k | £48.97k | £23.97k | £13.97k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 JUL 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 5 NOV 2003, 13 OCT 2005 AND 13 OCT 2008, NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 27 OCT 2010 REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 26 NOV 2010
Charitable objects
1. TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC CONCERNING THE BENEFITS OF SECURE COUPLE RELATIONSHIPS, MARRIAGE AND FAMILY LIFE IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THE EMOTIONAL, SEXUAL AND SPIRITUAL WELL-BEING OF INDIVIDUALS WHICH IS DERIVED FROM COMMITTED RELATIONSHIPS; 2. TO SEEK TO ENHANCE, THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL, OF ADULTS AND CHILDREN BY: 2.1. INCREASING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE BENEFIT OF COMMITTED COUPLE RELATIONSHIPS, MARRIAGE, AND FAMILY LIFE; AND 2.2. WORKING TO PREVENT POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS CAUSED BY THE BREAKDOWN OF SUCH RELATIONSHIPS; 3. TO PROVIDE COUNSELLING, ADVICE, EDUCATION, GUIDANCE AND RELIEF TO ADULTS AND/OR CHILDREN IN RELATION TO ANY ASPECT OF CONTEMPORARY LIFE OR WORK WHICH: 3.1. MAY PREJUDICE THEIR PHYSICAL OR MENTAL WELL BEING; OR 3.2. INFLUENCE, EITHER DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY, THEIR PRESENT OR FUTURE FAMILY OR COUPLE RELATIONSHIP; 4. TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; AND 5. TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO ALL OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS AND TO MAKE THE RESULTS AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
SURREY
Contact information
- Address:
-
MOORCROFT CENTRE FOR THE COMMUNITY
OLD SCHOOL PLACE
WOKING
GU22 9PB
- Phone:
- 01483602998
- Email:
- info@relatewestsurrey.org.uk
- Website:
-
relatewestsurrey.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window