Governing document CENTENARY THEATRE COMPANY
Charity number: 1080693

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 NOVEMBER 1983 AS AMENDED 19 JUNE 1984, 1 MAY 1986, 27 MAY 1993, 22 APRIL 1999, 23 NOVEMBER 1999, 11 APRIL 2000 AND 14 JUNE 2005
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE DRAMATIC AND OPERATIC ARTS, TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND TASTES IN THE SAID ARTS, TO ASSIST AND FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE GENERAL COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.