Trustees CENTENARY THEATRE COMPANY
Charity number: 1080693

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Grimes | Chair | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
JESSICA SCOTSON | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
EMMA ROBERTS | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
CADIE-ANNE DUTTON | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
PETER BRENNAN | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Georgia Rose Heyes | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clare Grimes | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kirstin Dunn | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lisa - Ann Connor | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARJORIE CLARE | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paula Martha Jackson | Trustee | 01 February 2008 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.