THE DYSCOVERY TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE DISSEMINATION OF INFORMATION TO HEALTH, EDUCATIONAL PROFESSIONAL AND EMPLOYERS. TO SUPPORT PARENTS AND THEIR CHILDREN BY INCREASING THEIR UNDERSTANDING OF THE CONDITION. TO PRODUCE SUITABLE EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS AND PRACTICAL TOOLS. TO RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSE OF DYSPRAXIA AND RELATED DIFFICULTIES. TO PROVIDE BURSARIES TO HELP FUND ASSESSMENTS TO INDIVIDUALS AND GROUPS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 October 2000: Standard registration
- 17 February 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2006 | 30/06/2007 | 30/06/2008 | 30/06/2009 | 30/06/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £287.39k | £81.51k | £39.34k | £6.80k | £14.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £228.11k | £102.23k | £33.29k | £33.02k | £28.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2011 | 16 February 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2010 | 10 February 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2009 | 07 December 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2008 | 01 March 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2008 | 17 March 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 9 OCTOBER 2000
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS OR SUFFERING AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN RELATION TO DYSPRAXIA, DEVELOPMENTAL COORDINATION DISORDER AND OTHER RELATED DISORDERS AND OTHERS THAT EFFECT LIVING AND LEARNING DIFFICULTIES THROUGHOUT THE UK INCLUDING BUT NOT SO AS TO LIMIT THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING: - A) THE PROMOTION OF BETTER DIAGNOSTIC AND TREATMENT FACILITIES B) THE PROMOTION OF BETTER UNDERSTANDING AMONGST HEALTH AND EDUCATION PROFESSIONALS C) THE PROVISION OF ADVICE TO PARENTS, PROFESSIONALS AND INDIVIDUALS D) THE PROMOTION OF A MORE COORDINATED RESPONSE AMONGST HEALTH, EDUCATION AND SOCIAL SERVICES E) THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT MATERIALS AND RESOURCES F) THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO CAUSATION, POPULATION AND INCIDENCE, THE ACTIOLOGY AND THE SOCIAL AND PSYCHOLOGICAL IMPACT G) THE SPONSORSHIP OF ASSESSMENTS, TREATMENTS AND EDUCATION AND IMPROVEMENT PROGRAMMES FOR SUFFERERS IN SUCH WAYS AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
THROUGHOUT THE UK.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window