Accounts and annual returns THE JUNCTION

Charity number: 1082324
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2007 11 April 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2007 18 April 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2006 29 June 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2006 18 July 2007 18 days late
Annual return 31 August 2005 31 May 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2005 31 May 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2004 21 June 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2004 21 June 2005 On Time