THE JUNCTION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Junction provides a range of free information, support and counselling services to young people under the age of 25 in the Tees Valley region.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Darlington
- Hartlepool
- Middlesbrough
- Redcar And Cleveland
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 07 September 2000: Standard registration
- 02 September 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 02 September 2008: Funds transferred to 1125578 THE JUNCTION FOUNDATION
- OK4 YOUNG PEOPLE'S CENTRE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2004 | 31/08/2005 | 31/08/2006 | 31/08/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £150.74k | £235.65k | £302.69k | £402.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £163.22k | £230.80k | £288.07k | £415.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2007 | 11 April 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2007 | 18 April 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2006 | 29 June 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2006 | 18 July 2007 | 18 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2005 | 31 May 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2005 | 31 May 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2004 | 21 June 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2004 | 21 June 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 AUGUST 1999 AS AMENDED ON 6 JULY 2000 AND 14 AUGUST 2001
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF YOUNG PEOPLE AGED UNDER 25 YEARS OF AGE IN THE BOROUGH OF REDCAR AND CLEVELAND, AND IN PARTICULAR THE RELIEF OF NEED AND HARDSHIP, PROVISION OF ADVICE, SUPPORT AND COUNSELLING SERVICES, AND PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THEIR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION SO TO ENHANCE THEIR PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF REDCAR AND CLEVELAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window