CHAILEY AIRFIELD MEMORIAL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Annual Commemoration Service at the Memorial in Plumpton Green, Sussex
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- East Sussex
Governance
- 06 April 2000: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Kington | Trustee | 04 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mary Irene WHITTLE | Trustee | 04 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD HERBERT WHITTLE | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD LAWRENCE WELLS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 October 2023 | 336 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 January 2022 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 January 2022 | 446 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 10/11/99, AS AMENDED BY DEED OF AMENDMENT MADE 1/04/00
Charitable objects
FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF RAF CHAILEY ADVANCED LANDING GROUND'S AVIATION HISTORY, IN PARTICULAR, CONCERNING ITS USE IN THE RUN-UP TO THE D-DAY LANDINGS AND THE CONTRIBUTION MADE BY THE POLISH AIRMEN AND OTHERS STATIONED THERE BY ERECTING A MEMORIAL TO MARK THE SITE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE CHAILEY & PLUMPTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Spitfire Art
20A High Street
Ditchling
HASSOCKS
West Sussex
BN6 8TA
- Phone:
- 01444241775
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window