WILLINGHAM VILLAGE HALL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide facility for recreational use, meeting venue, sport and social activities for the local community of all ages. Including organisations such as WI, Scouts, Girl guides and Parish council.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 28 March 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Rosemary Fieldson | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katie Marie Tunkin-Jones | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Irene Grace Panter | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Edwin Panter | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Margaret Edwards | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Marilyn Kirk | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Quincy Michael Connell | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robin Leonard Wright | Trustee | 05 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Helgi Gudmundsson | Trustee | 06 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Debra Lynn Cannon | Trustee | 05 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA LUCILLE BUSSEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROL WEBSTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
COLIN ANTHONY GILL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.69k | £23.16k | £6.45k | £7.47k | £9.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.96k | £13.43k | £10.44k | £10.49k | £12.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.50k | £20.03k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 19 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 27 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 07 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 17 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 6 OCTOBER 1980
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF WILLINGHAM-BY-STOW IN THE COUNTY OF LINCOLN WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF WILLINGHAM-BY-STOW IN THE COUNTY OF LINCOLN
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 High Street
Willingham By Stow
GAINSBOROUGH
Lincolnshire
DN21 5JZ
- Phone:
- 01427788425
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window