Accounts and annual returns EMERGENCY MEDICAL SERVICES AMBULANCE AID
Charity number: 1080448
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2007 | 11 March 2008 | 131 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2005 | Not submitted |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window