PREESALL AND KNOTT END YOUTH AND COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVISION OF BUILDING, FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT( INC IT SUITE) FOR COMMUNITY GROUPS ACTIVITIES ESPECIALLY YOUNG PEOPLES GROUP.Building is also available for hire for private use parties/ events for educational purposes etc and for public meetings.Is also listed as a county level 1 emergency rest centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £8,442 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lancashire
Governance
- 19 May 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP KEVIN ORME | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MATISSE HARRIETT BRIGNALL | Trustee | 28 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA PATTRICK | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP ORME | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.25k | £17.90k | £8.35k | £8.36k | £11.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.75k | £7.23k | £6.52k | £7.45k | £7.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £16.00k | N/A | N/A | £8.44k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03/11/99
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF PREESALL AND KNOTT END NEIGHBOURHOOD(HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX,SEXUAL ORIENTATION,RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS INA COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE BOTH FORMAL AND INFORMAL EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. A)TO ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE(HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE") AN TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME(WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
PREESALL AND KNOTT END
Contact information
- Address:
-
PREESALL & K.E. YOUTH AND COM ASSOC
Flat 4
Bay View Apartments
Bourne May Road
Knott End-on-Sea
POULTON-
- Phone:
- 01253811341
- Email:
- PHILIPORME29@TALKTALK.NET
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window