HODNET 2000 TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educational trust. We provide funds to young people under 25years of age, to further their education. i.e. money provided for books, computers, programs, lessons.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Shropshire
Governance
- 10 August 2000: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARTIN GRIFFITHS | Chair | 05 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Ross Ivor Underwood | Trustee | 06 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE LOCKLEY | Trustee | 24 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ROBERTS | Trustee | 05 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Sandy Russell | Trustee | 08 January 2011 |
|
|
||||
BEVERLEY TUDOR GRIFFITHS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14 | £531 | £544 | £328 | £1.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.07k | £3.05k | £1.12k | £1.34k | £3.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 March 2024 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 February 2021 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION DATED 26 JANUARY 2000 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 10 JULY 2000 AND 26TH JANUARY 2004 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 15 JUL 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS UNDER 25 YEARS WHO ARE RESIDENT OR WHO HAVE A PARENT WHO IS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AND BURSARIES TO ASSIST WITH THE COST OF STUDY TRIPS, THE PURCHASE OF EDUCATIONAL EQUIPMENT AND ANY OTHER ACTIVITIES OF EDUCATIONAL VALUE
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HODNET, WESTON-UNDER-REDCASTLE IN THE COUNTY OF SHROPSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
HAFOD
DRAYTON ROAD
HODNET
MARKET DRAYTON
TF9 3NH
- Phone:
- 07980292650
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window