Financial history FLINTSHIRE CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAUX

Charity number: 1090010
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £929.72k £1.02m £1.26m £1.45m £1.53m
Total expenditure £902.11k £950.04k £1.13m £1.42m £1.56m
Income from government contracts £36.26k £35.46k N/A £124.49k £130.34k
Income from government grants £718.63k £319.21k £446.12k £204.00k £204.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £891.51k £967.42k £1.18m £4.61k £1.63k
Income - Other trading activities £13.39k £48.65k £79.22k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £1.39m £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £5.12k £4.70k £3.38k £6.34k £0
Income - Other £19.70k £0 £0 £52.71k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £902.11k £950.04k £1.13m £1.42m £1.56m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £3.02k £3.12k £3.85k £2.40k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0