Financial history RICK RENNER MINISTRIES INCORPORATED

Charity number: 1081418
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £10.38k £12.16k £23.63k £27.79k £16.54k
Total expenditure £11.79k £4.63k £16.24k £38.85k £12.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A