THE LEWES NEW SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The school continues to develop its educational philosophy alongside a coherent system of monitoring and evaluation of the development of each child. This is achieved using the 'Respectful Communication' model, enabling children to problem-solve supporting the teachers to address difficult issues in non-judgmental and supportive ways. Ecologically sound practices are uppermost in the curriculum.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Sussex
Governance
- 27 March 2000: Standard registration
- THE LEWES SCHOOL LIMITED (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHARIF HORTHY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW HOLLOWAY | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Felicia McGarry | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Scherto Gill | Trustee | 29 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.64k | £24.29k | £18.62k | £249.25k | £349.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.72k | £42.25k | £31.85k | £90.31k | £787.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 25 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 03 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 01 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 14 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3-12-99 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16 OCT 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE TO DEVELOP THEIR FULL CAPACITIES AND ENABLE THEM TO BECOME RESPONSIBLE MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
EAST SUSSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
Will Taylor Limited
7 Bell Yard
London
WC2A 2JR
- Phone:
- 0752 232 7301
- Email:
- propertymanager@thelns.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window