Accounts and annual returns WAR VICTIMS RELIEF FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1081385
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2010 29 October 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 09 November 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2009 14 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 20 January 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 02 March 2009 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 02 March 2009 30 days late