WAR VICTIMS RELIEF FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing help and support to victims of war in middle east and in particular Iraq at the present time.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Egypt
- Iraq
- Jordan
- Kuwait
- Malaysia
- Syria
- United Arab Emirates
Governance
- 30 June 2000: Standard registration
- 20 February 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- W V R F (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £504.66k | £517.61k | £473.94k | £224.90k | £194.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £439.63k | £590.98k | £475.35k | £247.84k | £192.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £517.61k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £590.98k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 29 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 09 November 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 14 January 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 20 January 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 02 March 2009 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 02 March 2009 | 30 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 5TH DECEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
(A) TO RELIEVE THOSE PERSONS IN NEED, SUFFERING, POVERTY OR DISTRESS, PARTICULARLY THOSE PERSONS WHO HAVE SUFFERED AS AN EFFECT OF WAR IN THE MIDDLE EAST, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL SERVICES, COUNSELLING AND OTHER SUPPORT. (B) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, PARTICULARLY FOR THOSE PERSONS WHO HAVE SUFFERED AS AN EFFECT OF WAR IN THE MIDDLE EAST, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window