BOWNESS AND WINDERMERE COMMUNITY CARE TRUST

Charity number: 1079452
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Bowness and Windermere Community Care Trust exists to promote the wellbeing of the local community by engaging, responding, caring and serving.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £39,624
Total expenditure: £59,808

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Cumbria

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 February 2000: Standard registration
  • 14 July 2023: Funds received from 1038565 ROTARY CLUB OF AMBLESIDE TRUST FUND
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR BILL SMITH Chair
THE GOODLY DALE COTTAGE HOMES
Received: On time
WINDERMERE YOUTH PROJECT
Received: On time
Rev Elisabeth Marian Mullen Trustee 17 October 2018
None on record
Robert Agnew Pow Trustee 17 October 2018
THE GOODLY DALE COTTAGE HOMES
Received: On time
Anthony JAckson Trustee 07 November 2017
None on record
Rev JAMES JOHNSTON RICHARDS Trustee
SCHOOL CHARITY OF JOHN BRAITHWAITE
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARTIN, WINDERMERE
Received: On time
THOMAS COLLINSON
Received: On time
CHARITY OF MISS HANNAH COLLINSON
Received: On time
MARY ELIZABETH ULLOCK
Received: On time
WINDERMERE SCHOOL ENDOWMENT
Received: On time
BRENDAN JOSEPH BERNARD DRURY Trustee
THE APPLETHWAITE PARISH CENTRE TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £174.03k £81.25k £43.73k £25.13k £39.62k
Total expenditure £183.92k £85.31k £78.93k £59.46k £59.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £25.00k £44.96k £1.94k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 17 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 17 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 02 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 02 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 20 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 17 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
B W C C T
THE PHOENIX CENTRE
PHOENIX WAY
WINDERMERE
LA23 1BZ
Phone:
01539444825