THE SPARROW SCHOOLS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are to advance the education of young people in England and South Africa. The Charity has held several fundraising and awareness events in the year. It has received donations from organisations and individuals.The Sponsor a Child scheme continues to attract many regular donors who receive regular reports on the progress of the child they sponsor.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 September 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER LLOYD CHANDLER | Chair | 18 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Henry George Dunn | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Julie Richards | Trustee | 19 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Harry Hughes-Davies | Trustee | 19 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Henry Michael David Chaw | Trustee | 19 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Helen Brauer | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
JAMES DAVID SIMON MOSELEY | Trustee | 09 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP BROOKE | Trustee | 15 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Burnapp | Trustee | 18 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
George Marsh | Trustee | 29 August 2000 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER VIRGINIA HOLDEN-BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £117.33k | £64.93k | £91.30k | £99.86k | £116.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £122.35k | £82.70k | £108.19k | £86.38k | £104.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 29 AUGUST 2000, AMENDED BY DEED OF AMENDMENT DATED 3 JULY 2006.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE AND CHILDREN IN ENGLAND AND SOUTH AFRICA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) SUPPORTING THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SPARROW EDUCATIONAL TRUST ("SPARROW"), A NON-PROFIT ORGANISATION ESTABLISHED IN SOUTH AFRICA, AND OF ANY ORGANISATION IN SOUTH AFRICA WITH THE SAME OR SIMILAR AIMS AS SPARROW; AND (B) PROMOTING AND ASSISTING IN THE ORGANISATION OF EXCHANGES BETWEEN THE STAFF AND PUPILS OF SCHOOLS RUN BY SPARROW (OR BY ORGANISATIONS IN SOUTH AFRICA WITH THE SAME OR SIMILAR AIMS) ("SPARROW SCHOOLS") AND THE STAFF AND PUPILS OF ENGLISH SCHOOLS AND VICE VERSA.
Area of benefit
ENGLAND AND SOUTH AFRICA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 ALLEYN PARK
DULWICH
LONDON
SE21 7AA
- Phone:
- 02086703217
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window