THE BATH ISLAMIC SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BIS was established to serve the religious, educational, recreational, cultural, economic and social life of Muslims in B&NES. It aims to reduce inequalities in the community, encourage participation in public/community life, promote good relations between people of different cultural and religious groups and work with mainstream partners to build an environment of equality and social cohesion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bath And North East Somerset
Governance
- 22 May 2000: Standard registration
- BATH ISLAMIC SOCIETY LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bilal El Achab Oussallam | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ibraheem Choudhary | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Munieb El Haj | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Elbehiry | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ahmed Shaaban | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ahmed Elsayed | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.73k | £28.55k | £28.55k | £40.61k | £82.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.99k | £12.59k | £12.59k | £44.39k | £104.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 April 2023
(These accounts |
27 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 23 October 2021 | 237 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 23 October 2021 | 237 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 SEPTEMBER 1983 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 7 APRIL 2000. MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 28/04/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 01/04/2015
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC FAITH, THE ADVANCEMENT OF ISLAMIC EDUCATION AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE ISLAMIC COMMUNITY IN BATH AND SURROUNDING AREA.
Area of benefit
THE ISLAMIC COMMUNITY IN BATH AND SURROUNDING AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BATH ISLAMIC CENTRE
8 PIERREPONT STREET
BATH
BA1 1LA
- Phone:
- 01225460922
- Email:
- CONTACT@BATHMOSQUE.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window