THE INTERNATIONAL ALLIANCE OF ALS / MND ASSOCIATIONS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The International Alliance of ALS/MND Associations founded in November of 1992 to provide an international community for ALS/MND associations from around the world. Our vision is to engage our members, prospective members and other organizations in sharing resources globally, advancing awareness and supporting people with ALS/MND worldwide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£595,025
Donations and legacies | £29.17k | |
Charitable activities | £90.04k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £475.82k |
Total expenditure:
£693,541
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £693.54k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £693.54k |
People

1 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£90k to £100k | 1 |
One or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Northamptonshire
- Argentina
- Belgium
- Canada
- China
- Colombia
- Croatia
- France
- Germany
- Iceland
- India
- Ireland
- Israel
- Netherlands
- Russia
- Scotland
- South Africa
- Spain
- United States
Governance
- 23 February 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Calaneet Hadassah Balas | Chair | 05 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Bedford | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mary Ellen Bench | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Clare Sullivan | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Riccardo Zuccarino | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Evy Reviers | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Angela Harris | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tammy Moore | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gethin Thomas | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yohei Yomada | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marcela Santos | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £179.91k | £164.20k | £374.81k | £633.87k | £595.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £207.55k | £228.14k | £345.57k | £585.96k | £693.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £90.63k | £29.17k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £129.15k | £90.04k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £414.08k | £475.82k | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £800 | £693.54k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £585.16k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £229.87k | £268.79k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £18.37k | £155.81k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 21 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 21 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 18 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 18 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 24TH MARCH 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED ON 12TH NOVEMBER 1999 AND 31ST OCTOBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04 DEC 2016 as amended on 01 Dec 2019 as amended on 19 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
1) FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WORLDWIDE WHO ARE OR WHO ARE SUSPECTED OF BEING AFFECTED BY AMYOTROPHIC LATERAL SCLEROSIS (ALS)/ MOTOR NEURONE DISEASE (MND) AND ASSOCIATED CONDITIONS; AND 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS RELATING TO ALS/MND
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Francis Crick House
6 Summerhouse Road
Moulton Park
Northampton
ENGLAND
NN3 6BJ
- Phone:
- +1-647-203-2117
- Email:
- alliance@als-mnd.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.