Governing document THE INTERNATIONAL ALLIANCE OF ALS / MND ASSOCIATIONS

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 24TH MARCH 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED ON 12TH NOVEMBER 1999 AND 31ST OCTOBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04 DEC 2016 as amended on 01 Dec 2019 as amended on 19 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
1) FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WORLDWIDE WHO ARE OR WHO ARE SUSPECTED OF BEING AFFECTED BY AMYOTROPHIC LATERAL SCLEROSIS (ALS)/ MOTOR NEURONE DISEASE (MND) AND ASSOCIATED CONDITIONS; AND 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS RELATING TO ALS/MND
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.