Trustees THE INTERNATIONAL ALLIANCE OF ALS / MND ASSOCIATIONS
Charity number: 1079504

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Calaneet Hadassah Balas | Chair | 05 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Bedford | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mary Ellen Bench | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Clare Sullivan | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Riccardo Zuccarino | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Evy Reviers | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Angela Harris | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tammy Moore | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gethin Thomas | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yohei Yomada | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marcela Santos | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.