YOUTH DEVELOPMENT SUMMER CAMP PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In the last financial year we have fund raised and sent 7 disadvantaged children to summer camp.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 15 October 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 May 2001: Standard registration
- 29 October 2018: Removed (Does not operate)
- YDSCP (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 15/10/2011 | 15/10/2012 | 15/10/2013 | 15/10/2014 | 15/10/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.89k | £42.83k | £44.63k | £65.95k | £69.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.52k | £35.90k | £52.86k | £54.44k | £58.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 15 October 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 15 October 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 15 October 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 15 October 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 15 October 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 15 October 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 15 October 2015 | 12 September 2016 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 October 2015 | 12 September 2016 | 28 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27TH APRIL 2001
Charitable objects
TO HELP AND EDUCATE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM THROUGH RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF CAMPING HOLIDAYS FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO AND INCLUDING THE AGE OF 17 YEARS IRRESPECTIVE OF THEIR RACE, COLOUR OR CREED.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window