URBAN EYE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Urban Eye transforms run-down parts of the inner city around London through regeneration, imaginative design solutions, creative architectural lighting and community art. A true investment in the area. The Charity works in close partnership with key stakeholders and encourages participation with community groups and schools to help generate respect for the local environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £10,200 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 15 November 2001: Standard registration
- WESTWAY PROJECT (Previous name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DEZ O'NEILL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Henry Bacon | Trustee | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Toby Godfray | Trustee | 18 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sau-Fun Mo | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
NADIA STONE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW TRIGGS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AFOLABI SPENCE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MILES WATSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.69k | £38.55k | £12.02k | £22.52k | £50.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.13k | £28.22k | £38.49k | £43.39k | £35.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.20k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 7 AUGUST 1999 AS AMENDED 17 OCTOBER 2001 AND 6 MARCH 2008.
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST IN THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO NORTH KENSINGTON AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Area of benefit
NORTH KENSINGTON, LONDON BOROUGH OF KENSINGTON AND CHELSEA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Urban Eye
Unit 34
Baseline Business Studios
Whitchurch Road
London
W11 4AT
- Phone:
- 02072295921
- Email:
- office@urbaneye.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window