Accounts and annual returns WOLVERHAMPTON FOSTER CARE ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1083170
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 17 April 2012 77 days late
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 06 May 2011 95 days late