GRANGE FARM HOBBIES CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide facilities for Education, Recreation, Leisure and Sporting Activities for the people of North Lincolnshire. These include Amateur Dramatics, Bingo, Dancing (Tuition and Pleasure), Dog Training, Judo,Taekwondo,Aikido, Sub-Aqua, Wargames & Role Playing, Weight Lifting and Youth Club.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 16 September 2022
Total income includes £16,981 from 5 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 19 September 2001: Standard registration
- 12 October 2023: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 12 October 2023: Funds transferred to 1196138 GRANGE FARM COMMUNITY (HOBBIES) CENTRE
- GRANGE FARM COMMUNITY CENTRE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 16/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.53k | £64.59k | £68.38k | £73.23k | £58.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.61k | £57.48k | £62.81k | £42.36k | £43.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £46.34k | £16.98k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 16 September 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 16 September 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 16 September 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 September 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 17 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 17 December 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED OCTOBER 1986 AS AMENDED 21 JUNE 2000 CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED ON 19/11/2013
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF NORTH LINCOLNSHIRE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B) ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MANAGE AND MAINTAIN THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTIVES. (C) PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Area of benefit
NORTH LINCOLNSHIRE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window