Financial history MANNINGHAM MILLS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity Number: 1093696
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014
Total gross income £190.62k £178.87k £171.77k £143.63k £149.95k
Total expenditure £218.55k £217.73k £201.49k £161.50k £186.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A