CWMNI BEDDGELERT CYF

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Resident and visitor internet facilities in beddgelert
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Gwynedd
Governance
- 28 June 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
June Margaret Jones | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ken Owen | Trustee | 01 January 2006 |
|
|
||||
EIRLYS NESS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAIR WYN ROWLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WILLIAM ALUN HUGHES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DEREK WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.60k | £17.80k | £9.99k | £7.36k | £8.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.19k | £9.60k | £9.87k | £10.93k | £5.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 17 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 NOVEMBER 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 31 MAY 2000
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF, AND VISITORS TO, BEDDGELERT TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE THE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATIONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Area of benefit
BEDDGELERT
Contact information
- Address:
-
ERYRI WEN
CAERNARFON ROAD
BEDDGELERT
CAERNARFON
LL55 4UY
- Phone:
- 01766771398
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window