GRACENOTES ACAPELLA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education of the general public in the art form of Acapella and Close Harmony Singing, by way of our public performances. We encourage people to join with our group in order to take part in basic music coaching and to understand the craft of singing. Members and non-members are encouraged to improve their vocal knowledge and expertise thereby instilling self confidence by mastering new skills.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
- Devon
Governance
- 19 March 2002: Standard registration
- BRUNEL LADIES HARMONY CHORUS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sandra Matanle | Chair | 05 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Lewin | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Heidi Walsh | Trustee | 05 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN PHILLIPS | Trustee | 05 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.06k | £5.16k | £11.45k | £14.91k | £13.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.42k | £3.48k | £12.58k | £16.57k | £11.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 September 2024 | 311 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 November 2021 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 FEBRUARY 2002 AS AMENDED 17 DECEMBER 2007. AS AMENDED ON 21 AUG 2017 as amended on 25 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL ASPECTS OF BARBERSHOP HARMONY AND SINGING IN THE BARBERSHOP HARMONY STYLE: DEVELOPING PERSONAL AND GROUP SKILLS BY INDIVIDUAL/GROUP COACHING. ENCOURAGING UNITY OF PURPOSE WITHIN THE CHORUS. THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC. PERFORMING TO OUTSIDE INTERESTED PARTIES. QUARTET SINGING. THE CLUB SHALL BE NON-PROFIT MAKING AND WILL NOT DISCRIMINATE ON GROUNDS OF RACE, CLASS, SEX, AGE, DISABILITY, POLITICAL VIEW OR RELIGION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE. CORNWALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Dudley Road
Plympton
Plymouth
PL7 1RX
- Phone:
- 01752344075
- Email:
- catherinelewin@me.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window