THORNBURY U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educational related activities for people in the "Third AGE"
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gloucestershire
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 29 March 2000: Standard registration
- THORNBURY UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (U3A) (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roger Steer | Chair | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Bilson | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Ricketts | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Rendell | Trustee | 05 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Light | Trustee | 05 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Marion Moszoro | Trustee | 05 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paige Maxwell Warr | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Wells | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA ANN WELLS | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £212.82k | £70.79k | £31.27k | £103.82k | £122.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £209.66k | £69.64k | £27.20k | £98.59k | £120.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 08 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 08 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 13 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 13 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 21 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 21 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 19 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 19 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 04 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 04 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 NOVEMBER 1999 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 as amended on 27 Jun 2020 as amended on 27 Jun 2020 as amended on 27 Jun 2020 as amended on 27 Jun 2020 as amended on 27 Jun 2020 as amended on 27 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
THORNBURY AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Winpenny Cottage
Bagstone Road
Bagstone
WOTTON-UNDER-EDGE
Gloucestershire
GL12 8BD
- Phone:
- 07772411705
- Website:
-
thornburyu3a.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window