Governing document Tranby Trust

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 01/12/1999 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 22/10/2008 AS AMENDED ON 22/08/2013 AS AMENDED ON 20/07/2015 as amended on 01 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ('THE OBJECTS'), IN THE CITY OF KINGSTON UPON HULL AND THE EAST RIDING OF YORKSHIRE TO PROVIDE ASSISTANCE TO PUPILS, BY SUBSIDISING THE COST OF CO-CURRICULAR AND EXTRA-CURRICULAR ACTIVITIES. PUPILS MUST HAVE BEEN ACCEPTED BY HULL COLLEGIATE SCHOOL FOR ENTRY AND HAVE REACHED THE AGE OF AT LEAST 11 YEARS. SUCH FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE WILL BE DECIDED BY THE TRUST ALONE AND BASED UPON 1. COMMITMENT TO STUDY IN THE CLASSROOM 2. EXEMPLARY BEHAVIOUR 3. THE COST OF CO-CURRICULAR AND/ OR EXTRA-CURRICULAR ACTIVITIES CANNOT BE MET BY PARENT(S)/ GUARDIAN(S) OF PUPIL(S) AT HULL COLLEGIATE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
KINGSTON UPON HULL AND EAST RIDING
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.