UNITED KINGDOM ASSOCIATION FOR MEDICAL AID TO SRI LANKA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This year we donated life saving equipment to Castle Street maternity Hospital Colombo. Mainly a premature baby ventilator, Incubator and ten pulse oximeters. In addition we have been supplying dialising catheters and solutions to needy patients with Chronic Kidney disease.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 02 May 2000: Standard registration
- MEDICAL AID TO SRI LANKA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NALINI RAMASINGHE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
PUSHPA RANJANI MUTHUMALA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr KUSUM SEKARA SIRIMANNA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DARSHANA RANMUTHU | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
D.U RANASINGHE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.60k | £30.79k | £27.20k | £21.67k | £35.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.44k | £28.11k | £42.52k | £19.10k | £20.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 10 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 JUNE 1995 AS AMENDED 25 MARCH 2000 AND 26TH OCTOBER 2003. as amended on 30 Jan 2000
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, DISEASE AND POVERTY IN SRI LANKA 1) BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING THE EXISTING MEDICAL CARE SYSTEM IN SRI LANKA 2) BY HELPING NEEDY PATIENTS IN SRI LANKA WITH NECESSARY LIFE SAVING EQUIPMENT AND MEDICATION THAT THEY CANNOT AFFORD TO BUY THEMSELVES. 3) BY PROMOTING AND ASSISTING THE PREVENTIVE CARE IN SRI LANKA.
Area of benefit
SRI LANKA
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 ASHURST ROAD
BARNET
EN4 9LF
- Phone:
- 02084493965
- Email:
- duranasinghe@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window