LIBERTY HOUSE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We meet for religion activities, for humanitarian and humanitarian needs & activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 23 October 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hackney
Governance
- 28 June 2000: Standard registration
- CHRIST LIBERTY MINISTRIES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABIMBOLA KADARA | Trustee | 26 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
ADENIKE WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PASTOR KAYODE OGUNS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 23/10/2020 | 23/10/2021 | 23/10/2022 | 23/10/2023 | 23/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.54k | £15.87k | £18.60k | £23.34k | £21.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.38k | £8.92k | £11.06k | £22.68k | £21.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 23 October 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 23 October 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 23 October 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 23 October 2021 | 03 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 23 October 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 JUNE 2000
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION THROUGH BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE PROVISION OF SERVICES, RELIGIOUS EDUCATION CLASSES, SEMINARS AND CRUSADES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
5
Hensley Point
41 Bradstock Road
London
E9 5BE
- Phone:
- 07450842113
- Email:
- liberty.house@aol.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window