Accounts and annual returns HORNBY ST MARGARETS C E PRIMARY SCHOOL (PTA)

Charity Number: 1089431
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 23 July 2023 02 October 2024 132 days late
Accounts and TAR 23 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 23 July 2022 17 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 23 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 23 July 2021 17 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 23 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 23 July 2020 07 February 2022 260 days late
Accounts and TAR 23 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 23 July 2019 26 March 2021 307 days late
Accounts and TAR 23 July 2019 Not Required