Accounts and annual returns COMMUNITY ACTION PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1081504
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 02 March 2009 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2007 08 September 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 31 August 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2005 23 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 23 January 2006 On Time