Relationships Wessex Ltd

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity provides a range of services to promote and support relationships. These services include counselling for couples, individuals,families, children and young people. Psychosexual Therapy, Lifeskills training and development and mediation. These services are offered in various locations throughout Dorset and South Wiltshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £75,320 from 5 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Dorset
- Somerset
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 28 February 2000: Standard registration
- 05 November 2014: Funds received from 267075 RELATE DORSET MARRIAGE GUIDANCE
- RELATE DORSET AND SOUTH WILTSHIRE LIMITED (Previous name)
- RELATE DORSET LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susanna Hill | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mary Chamberlain | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Delafield | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Andrew Richards | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Diana Fairhurst | Trustee | 02 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Mary Baker | Trustee | 05 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £359.89k | £237.08k | £296.68k | £239.65k | £294.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £329.69k | £295.76k | £336.32k | £355.26k | £391.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £86.65k | £80.66k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £60.00k | £32.34k | N/A | £75.32k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 5 MAY 1998 AS AMENDED ON 12 MAY 2003. as amended on 02 Apr 2025
Charitable objects
A) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC CONCERNING THE INSTITUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO EMOTIONAL, PHYSICAL AND SEXUAL RELATIONSHIPS AND WITH A VIEW TO DEVELOPING PERSONAL RESPONSIBILITIES AND ENRICHING FAMILY LIFE. B) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECTS OF MARRIED LIFE AND TO PUBLISH THE RESULT OF ALL SUCH RESEARCH. C) TO SAFEGUARD AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL OF ADULTS AND CHILDREN AND TO PREVENT POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS CAUSED BY THE BREAK-UP OF THE MARRIAGE.
Area of benefit
DORSET AND SOUTH WILTSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
RELATE DORSET
UNIT 2
POUNDBURY BUSINESS CENTRE
MIDDLE FARM WAY
POUNDBURY DORCHESTER
DT1 3WA
- Phone:
- 01305268690
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window