Financial history SWANSEA COMMUNITY FARM

Charity Number: 1079907
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £197.14k £236.66k £209.30k £264.48k £376.09k
Total expenditure £189.87k £182.59k £223.17k £254.35k £331.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £7.68k N/A
Income from government grants £3.00k £32.02k £56.92k £94.17k £142.30k