Trustees SWANSEA COMMUNITY FARM

Charity number: 1079907
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Clare Cooper Chair 05 September 2023
None on record
Chris Badman Trustee 08 April 2025
None on record
Ann Fairnington Bell Trustee 25 March 2025
None on record
Meinir Morgan Trustee 21 March 2025
None on record
Nirdeep Kaur Demello Trustee 04 December 2024
None on record