OFFWELL ENVIRONMENT LINK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. To advance the education of the public in biology, ecology, the environment, conservation and the countryside and its heritage. 2. To support the charitable work of the Offwell Woodland Education Centre (operated by the Offwell Woodland & Wildlife Trust). We organise guided tours, forays field days, biological surveys and practical educational and research projects - all led by experts. We orga
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Devon
- Dorset
- Somerset
Governance
- 05 July 2000: Standard registration
- 30 December 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- OELINK (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.25k | £20.63k | £5.96k | £8.51k | £2.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.90k | £8.71k | £13.69k | £13.70k | £7.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 23 September 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | 22 September 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 15 December 2008 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | 04 December 2008 | 34 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 20 September 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | 20 September 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 24 October 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 24 October 2006 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 11 MAY 1999 AS AMENDED ON 2 MAY 2000 AND 17 MAY 2005.
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BIOLOGY, ECOLOGY, THE ENVIRONMENT, CONSERVATION AND THE COUNTRYSIDE AND ITS HERITAGE. (2) TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE OFFWELL WOODLAND EDUCATION CENTER (OPERATED BY THE OFFWELL WOODLAND AND WILDLIFE TRUST)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE DEVON, DORSET AND SOMERSET.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window