THE BERRYHILL FIELDS CENTRE TRUST LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 19 December 2001: Standard registration
- 05 February 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2013 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 JANUARY 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 6 MARCH 2000 AND 31 AUGUST 2001
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VISITOR INFORMATION AND COMMUNITY RESOURCE CENTRE WITHIN THE CONSERVATION AREA KNOWN AS BERRYHILL FIELDS; AND B) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
STOKE ON TRENT, STAFFORDSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window