Accounts and annual returns FEATHERSTONE AND HILTON COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1087077
Charity reporting is overdue by 105 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 105 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 105 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 05 April 2024 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 05 April 2024 65 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 05 April 2024 430 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 05 April 2024 430 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 05 April 2024 795 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 05 April 2024 795 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 October 2023 991 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 October 2023 991 days late Download Open in new window