Trustees TNB GARRISON EARLY YEARS AND PLAY
Charity number: 1079392

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VICTORIA SETH | Chair | 06 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Evangeline Rabczak | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Kate Colbourne DYKES | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Stewart Haarhoff | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steven David Pople | Trustee | 07 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Damion Baines | Trustee | 30 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janice Dodd | Trustee | 11 February 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.