Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF KIMBOLTON CASTLE TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1081970
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £21.73k £18.71k £26.08k £53.50k £41.31k
Total expenditure £19.36k £13.87k £21.73k £42.62k £61.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A