ROTARY CLUB OF KIMBOLTON CASTLE TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising funds for the relief of the poor and needy, or for such other charitable purpose, institution, society, or object as directed in a duly constituted meeting.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bedford
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 10 August 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bryony Jo Doughty | Chair | 03 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOY HARTIGAN | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charles Nicholas Monsell | Trustee | 16 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Matthews | Trustee | 16 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Andrew Frank Vincent Pooley | Trustee | 16 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Christopher Paul Davies | Trustee | 12 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Eric Joyce | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Terence Geoffrey Soult | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.73k | £18.71k | £26.08k | £53.50k | £41.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.36k | £13.87k | £21.73k | £42.62k | £61.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 25 June 2024 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 25 June 2024 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30 SEPTEMBER 1999.
Charitable objects
TO APPLY BOTH THE CAPITAL AND INCOME TO OR FOR THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY OR TO OR FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE INSTITUTION SOCIETY OR OBJECT AS THE ROTARY CLUB OF KIMBOLTON CASTLE SHALL IN DULY CONSTITUTED MEETING FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE HUNTINGDON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Manor Farm House
High Street
Little Staughton
BEDFORD
MK44 2BH
- Phone:
- 01480860834
- Email:
- andrew.pooley8@icloud.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window