Accounts and annual returns CENTRE FOR CORPORATE ACCOUNTABILITY ( CCA )

Charity number: 1105658
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 30 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 27 May 2009 116 days late
Annual return 31 March 2007 06 March 2008 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 06 March 2008 35 days late
Annual return 31 March 2006 16 February 2007 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 16 February 2007 16 days late