Financial history GOAN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION ( NORTH LONDON )

Charity number: 1082965
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £10.93k £12.38k £16.32k £6.53k £9.95k
Total expenditure £10.98k £10.84k £15.44k £5.85k £8.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9.80k £10.00k N/A N/A N/A