HORSLEY WHEEL OF CARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help any person residing in the parishes of East and West Horsley who is in need of assistance, by provision of transport, home visits or any other helpful or supportive activity. We also run a weekly scrabble and an exercise club.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
114 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 20 July 2001: Standard registration
- THE WEST HORSLEY WHEEL OF CARE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ruth Elaine Blowers | Trustee | 30 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Judith Young | Trustee | 30 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Lush | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Lockhart Armitage | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carolynne Elizabeth Garcia | Trustee | 13 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Mark Kevin Blowers | Trustee | 14 January 2021 |
|
|||||
SARAH ELIZABETH CHRISTIANSEN | Trustee | 09 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Dane | Trustee | 24 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.50k | £1.72k | £6.91k | £4.35k | £11.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.79k | £3.39k | £3.01k | £8.48k | £7.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24/01/2000 AS AMENDED ON 14/06/2001 AS AMENDED ON 23/06/2004 AS AMENDED ON 22/05/2014 AS AMENDED ON 24 MAY 2018 AS AMENDED ON 30 MAR 2023
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECT ("THE OBJECT") IS TO HELP ANY PERSON RESIDING IN THE PARISHES OF EAST AND WEST HORSLEY AND NEIGHBOURING AREAS, WHO IS IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE, BY PROVISION OF TRANSPORT, HOME VISITS OR ANY OTHER HELPFUL OR SUPPORTIVE ACTIVITY.
Area of benefit
WEST HORSLEY AND NEIGHBOURING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 Parkside Place
East Horsley
LEATHERHEAD
Surrey
KT24 5BZ
- Phone:
- 01483281221
- Email:
- mark1@blowermk.plus.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window