THE INSTITUTE FOR CANCER VACCINES AND IMMUNOTHERAPY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity of the charity is the advancement of education and the protection and preservation of public health by promoting research into the treatment of cancer by vaccine technology and by promoting the dissemination of the useful results of such research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 April 2000: Standard registration
- CVI (Working name)
- THE CANCER VACCINE INSTITUTE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sir HENRY RICHARD GEERS COTTERELL Bt OBE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Saffron Emily Rankin Guy | Trustee | 03 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDER CHARLES JOHNS | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JEMMA KATE NATASHA FREEMAN | Trustee |
|
||||||
MRS RESHMA ASHRAF MASON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GUY EDMUND SANGSTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £620.00k | £685.03k | £566.39k | £620.77k | £260.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £941.00k | £794.18k | £743.57k | £584.94k | £577.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £590.00k | £682.91k | £565.87k | £601.08k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £19.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £682.91k | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £11.00k | £2.12k | £520 | £19.69k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £868.00k | £728.70k | £609.02k | £503.54k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £73.00k | £65.48k | £64.12k | £81.39k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £18.64k | £16.42k | £16.97k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £70.44k | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 May 2022 | 106 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26 NOV 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30 MAR 2000 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 22 MAR 2016
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF PUBLIC HEALTH BY PROMOTING RESEARCH INTO THE TREATMENT OF CANCER BY VACCINE TECHNOLOGY, AND BY PROMOTING THE DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIT 15 ABBEVILLE MEWS
88 CLAPHAM PARK ROAD
LONDON
SW4 7BX
- Phone:
- 08456020662
- Email:
- info@cancervaccine.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window