ACORN CHRISTIAN FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Acorn remains engaged in, and committed to being a transformative agent in today's multifaceted society. Our events are focused on training individuals and groups in ministry and skills for the journey of Christian healing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
Governance
- 27 March 2000: Standard registration
- ACORN (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gordon Edward Sykes-Little | Chair | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Sherbourne | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Sara Fretheim | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
REVEREND ANDREW JOHN HEBER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £209.33k | £167.53k | £151.74k | £113.77k | £91.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £207.33k | £159.19k | £164.72k | £123.50k | £113.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 SEPTEMBER 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 21 MARCH 2000
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE RELIGION, IN PARTICULAR TO FURTHER THE UNDERSTANDING OF HEALTH AND HEALING WITHIN THE MINISTRY OF MAINSTREAM CHRISTIAN CHURCHES AND HEALTH PROFESSIONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Acorn Christian Cobbin Floyd Ltd
15A Station Road
EPPING
Essex
CM16 4HG
- Phone:
- 07745148970
- Email:
- info@acornchristian.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window